MT HB147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring search warrant for gov access to electronic devices
Title
Requiring search warrant for gov access to electronic devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-04-14 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-04 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-03 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-12-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |