MT HB148 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise privacy laws related to electronic communications
Title
Generally revise privacy laws related to electronic communications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-03 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2017-03-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-12-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |