MT HB149 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Define real party in interest for landlord tenant contracts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Define real party in interest for landlord tenant contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 (H) Died in Standing Committee
2011-02-24 (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2011-01-17 (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary
2011-01-14 (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2011-01-03 (H) First Reading
2010-12-31 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2010-12-28 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2010-12-28 (H) Introduced
2010-12-20 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2010-12-20 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2010-12-16 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2010-12-16 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2010-12-16 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2010-12-16 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2010-12-11 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2010-11-30 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2010-08-30 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback