MT HB149 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise ditch easement laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise ditch easement laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24House(H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Agriculture
2013-02-28House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2013-02-22House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Agriculture
2013-02-19House(H) Hearing (H) Agriculture
2013-01-11House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Agriculture
2013-01-08 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2013-01-08House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture
2013-01-08House(H) First Reading
2013-01-08House(H) Introduced
2013-01-08 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2012-12-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2012-12-28 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2012-12-28 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2012-12-27 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2012-12-27 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2012-12-27 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2012-12-26 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2012-12-21 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2012-12-21 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2012-12-11 (C) Draft On Hold
2012-11-26 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback