MT HB168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require investigators for the office of public defender to be licensed
Title
Require investigators for the office of public defender to be licensed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Professions and Occupations Generally
Public Officers and Employees
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Professions and Occupations Generally
Public Officers and Employees
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=168&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0199/HB0168_1.pdf |