MT HB183 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deputize COPP in-house counsel
Title
Deputize COPP in-house counsel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2019-03-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) State Administration |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2019-01-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-01-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |