MT HB19 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise penalty and interest provisions related to tax law enforcement
Title
Revise penalty and interest provisions related to tax law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2013-05-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-22 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-31 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-30 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-01-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2013-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2012-12-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2012-11-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-16 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-09-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-09-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-09-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-09-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-09-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2012-09-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-09-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-09-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-05-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |