MT HB19 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise definition of "high-poverty county" for Big Sky Economic Development
Title
Revise definition of "high-poverty county" for Big Sky Economic Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-08 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-10 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Local Government |
2019-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Local Government |
2019-01-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2019-01-22 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2019-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Local Government |
2019-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2018-12-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-03 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-11-30 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |