MT HB192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to privacy in communications
Title
Revise laws related to privacy in communications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-02 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2019-01-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-14 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2018-12-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-12-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |