MT HB21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize funding for the multifamily coal trust home loan program
Title
Authorize funding for the multifamily coal trust home loan program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-02-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-01-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-01-06 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified (H) Appropriations |
2021-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2020-12-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2020-12-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2020-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-10-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-09-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-09-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |