MT HB211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Address recruitment and retention of K-12 quality educators
Title
Address recruitment and retention of K-12 quality educators
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-07 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-03-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-25 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Education |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2019-01-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2018-12-31 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-09-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Appropriations
Revenue, State
School Finance
Schools and Education
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Individual Income
Revenue, State
School Finance
Schools and Education
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Individual Income