MT HB226 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow increase property tax abatement for new or expanding industry
Title
Allow increase property tax abatement for new or expanding industry
Sponsors
Rep. Zac Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Taxation |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-12 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2017-01-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |