MT HB27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise agricultural valuation laws related to property under a residence
Title
Revise agricultural valuation laws related to property under a residence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2017-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-28 | (C) Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available | |
2016-12-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2016-12-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-11-30 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-30 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-11-15 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-10-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-10-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-10-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-10-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-10-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-09-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |