MT HB300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise taxes and the distribution of revenue through sales tax
Title
Generally revise taxes and the distribution of revenue through sales tax
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-11 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2019-01-24 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2019-01-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-01-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2019-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-08-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Appropriation Process
Appropriations
Bond Issues, Public
Cities and Towns
City Finance
County Finance
Legislature
Local Finance
Revenue, Local
Revenue, State
Rule Making
School Finance
State Finance
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Agriculture/Livestock
Taxation--Property
Taxation--Sales
Appropriations
Bond Issues, Public
Cities and Towns
City Finance
County Finance
Legislature
Local Finance
Revenue, Local
Revenue, State
Rule Making
School Finance
State Finance
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Agriculture/Livestock
Taxation--Property
Taxation--Sales
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=300&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0399/HB0300_1.pdf |