MT HB339 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish loan repayment program for child protection specialists
Title
Establish loan repayment program for child protection specialists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-12 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-10-03 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |