MT HB391 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for Montana earned income tax credit
Title
Provide for Montana earned income tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Taxation |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-04-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Taxation |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Taxation |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-11-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-10-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-25 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-06-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |