MT HB400 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise supplemental assistance program laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise supplemental assistance program laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Senate(S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-04-08Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-04-08Senate(S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-04-03Senate(S) Hearing Canceled (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-03-29Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2019-03-29Senate(S) First Reading
2019-03-28House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-28House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2019-03-28House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-03-26House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations
2019-03-25House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations
2019-03-15House(H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
2019-02-22House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Appropriations
2019-02-20House(H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2019-02-20House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-02-20House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-02-18 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2019-02-18House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services
2019-02-15House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services
2019-02-11House(H) Hearing (H) Human Services
2019-02-06 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2019-02-06House(H) First Reading (H) Human Services
2019-02-06House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services
2019-02-06House(H) Introduced
2019-02-05 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2019-02-01 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2019-02-01 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-01-31 (C) Draft in Assembly
2019-01-31 (C) Executive Director Review
2019-01-31 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-01-31 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-01-30 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2019-01-30 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2019-01-29 (C) Draft in Edit
2019-01-29 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2019-01-29 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2019-01-29 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2019-01-29 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-11-15 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback