MT HB477 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Enact firearm education laws for children
Title
Enact firearm education laws for children
Sponsors
Rep. Moffie Funk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-20 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-13 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-10-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |