MT HB498 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow probationers and parolees to use medical marijuana
Title
Allow probationers and parolees to use medical marijuana
Sponsors
Rep. Jade Bahr [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |