MT HB514 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise campaign finance laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise campaign finance laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-27House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2015-02-25House(H) Adverse Committee Report Adopted (H) State Administration
2015-02-25House(H) Motion Carried
2015-02-24House(H) Committee Report--Bill Not Passed (H) State Administration
2015-02-24House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed (H) State Administration
2015-02-24House(H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) State Administration
2015-02-20House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration
2015-02-20House(H) Hearing (H) State Administration
2015-02-14House(H) First Reading
2015-02-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-02-13House(H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration
2015-02-13House(H) Introduced
2015-02-13 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-02-11 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-02-11 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-02-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-02-10 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-02-10 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-02-10 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2015-02-09 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-02-06 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-02-05 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-01-29 (C) Draft On Hold
2015-01-20 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-01-19 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback