MT HB528 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create veterinary retail facility permits
Title
Create veterinary retail facility permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Agriculture |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Agriculture |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |