MT HB533 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to qualifications for and edu. of board of invest. members
Title
Revise laws related to qualifications for and edu. of board of invest. members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2017-05-17 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2017-05-12 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2017-05-11 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2017-04-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2017-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-02-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-25 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2017-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-15 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-15 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-02-13 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-11-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |