MT HB610 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow list of candidates compiled by SOS to be used as distribution list
Title
Allow list of candidates compiled by SOS to be used as distribution list
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-02-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-14 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-13 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-01-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=610&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0699/HB0610_1.pdf |