MT HB619 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise student data privacy laws
Title
Revise student data privacy laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-03-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-03-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-10-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |