MT HB635 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a DUI reduction grant program
Title
Establish a DUI reduction grant program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-02-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-18 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2019-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Alcohol and Drugs
Appropriations
Indians
Law Enforcement
Legislature
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Schools and Education
Taxation (Generally)
Transportation
Appropriations
Indians
Law Enforcement
Legislature
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Schools and Education
Taxation (Generally)
Transportation
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=635&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0699/HB0635_1.pdf |