MT HB684 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Implement provisions of HB2, Section D, subcommittee on justice system
Title
Implement provisions of HB2, Section D, subcommittee on justice system
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Regier [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-21 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-03-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |