MT HB719 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - (H) Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establish the Jeannette Rankin memorial highway

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish the Jeannette Rankin memorial highway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10House(H) Signed by Governor
2019-05-01House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-30Senate(S) Signed by President
2019-04-26House(H) Signed by Speaker
2019-04-17 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2019-04-17House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2019-04-16House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2019-04-16Senate(S) Returned to House
2019-04-16Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2019-04-16Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-04-15Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2019-04-15Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-04-10Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation
2019-04-09Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation
2019-04-09Senate(S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation
2019-04-01Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
2019-04-01Senate(S) First Reading
2019-03-29House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-29House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2019-03-29House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-03-28House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-03-28House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-03-26 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2019-03-26 (C) Sponsors Engrossed
2019-03-26House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation
2019-03-25House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation
2019-03-25House(H) Hearing (H) Transportation
2019-03-23House(H) Sponsor List Modified
2019-03-22House(H) Sponsor List Modified
2019-03-21 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2019-03-21House(H) First Reading (H) Transportation
2019-03-21House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation
2019-03-21House(H) Introduced
2019-03-20 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2019-03-19 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2019-03-19 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-03-18 (C) Draft in Assembly
2019-03-18 (C) Executive Director Review
2019-03-18 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-03-18 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-03-18 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2019-03-18 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2019-03-18 (C) Draft in Edit
2019-03-15 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2019-03-15 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-12-17 (C) Draft On Hold
2018-11-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=719&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0799/HB0719_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0799/HB0719_2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0719TRH190325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1214&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1294&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0719HIS190409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1607&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1655&P_SESS=20191

Bill Comments

feedback