MT HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expand alternate dispute resolution services of the Department of Agriculture

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand alternate dispute resolution services of the Department of Agriculture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25House(H) Died in Process
2019-04-01House(H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
2019-01-31House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Agriculture
2019-01-22House(H) Hearing (H) Agriculture
2019-01-10House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Agriculture
2019-01-09House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2019-01-08House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2019-01-07House(H) First Reading (H) Agriculture
2019-01-04House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2018-12-17House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2018-12-16House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture
2018-12-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2018-12-13House(H) Introduced
2018-11-29 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-11-29 (C) Draft in Assembly
2018-11-29 (C) Executive Director Review
2018-11-28 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2018-11-28 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2018-11-21 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2018-11-21 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2018-11-20 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-11-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-11-01 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-09-07 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback