MT HB89 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise public defender fees
Title
Revise public defender fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-02-06 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-05 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2018-12-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-08-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |