MT HJ13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution regarding the federal telecommunications law
Title
Resolution regarding the federal telecommunications law
Sponsors
Rep. David Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-03-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |