MT HJ2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue estimating resolution
Title
Revenue estimating resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-04-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for Executive Action (H) Taxation |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Estimating Resolution Transmittal |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2018-12-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2018-12-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-05 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-11-27 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |