MT HJ30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study of exemption in privacy in communication statute for abuse victims
Title
Interim study of exemption in privacy in communication statute for abuse victims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-03-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-13 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=30&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HouJoint/HJ0030_1.pdf |