MT HJ60 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Summary
Interim study on early childhood care and education system
Title
Interim study on early childhood care and education system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2019-04-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Education |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-04-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-04-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-04-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-04-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-04-06 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |