MT HJ64 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Process
Summary
Interim study of best practices to reduce DUIs
Title
Interim study of best practices to reduce DUIs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-04-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-04-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-04-15 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-04-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-04-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-04-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |