MT HR2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House resolution supporting elimination of Montana intertie rate
Title
House resolution supporting elimination of Montana intertie rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-02-15 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |