MT SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise school funding related to oil and gas production taxes
Title
Revise school funding related to oil and gas production taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Education |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Education |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Education |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2019-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2018-12-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-11-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-10-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-10-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-10-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-10-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-10-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-10-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |