MT SB126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to property valuation appeal process
Title
Revise laws related to property valuation appeal process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2017-05-15 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2017-05-08 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) On Motion Rules Suspended |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2017-01-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-01-25 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |