MT SB134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Free Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Free Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise campaign finance laws related to electioneering communications
Title
Generally revise campaign finance laws related to electioneering communications
Sponsors
Sen. Dee Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) Conference Committee Dissolved |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Dissolved (S) Conference |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2019-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-01-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |