MT SB142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise tax haven list for corporate income tax purposes
Title
Revise tax haven list for corporate income tax purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |