MT SB152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal sunset on 6-mill university levy
Title
Repeal sunset on 6-mill university levy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-01-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-18 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |