MT SB17 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize creation of regional fire protection service authorities
Title
Authorize creation of regional fire protection service authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2019-01-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2018-12-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-03 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-11-23 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-10-24 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-10-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-10-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-07-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Cities and Towns
Fires and Fire Protection
Local Government
Revenue, Local
State/Other Government Levels, Immunity From Suit
Fires and Fire Protection
Local Government
Revenue, Local
State/Other Government Levels, Immunity From Suit