MT SB177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise authority of self-governing local governments
Title
Revise authority of self-governing local governments
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2017-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |