MT SB195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise energy performance contracting laws
Title
Generally revise energy performance contracting laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-23 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-22 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-22 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-04 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |