MT SB217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to vital statistics
Title
Revise laws related to vital statistics
Sponsors
Sen. Kris Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - (S) Motion to Reconsider Failed (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - (S) Motion to Reconsider Failed (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2015-05-06 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2015-04-30 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2015-04-29 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Human Services |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Human Services |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Motion to Reconsider Failed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-02-02 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-02-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |