MT SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise major facility siting act amendment process
Title
Revise major facility siting act amendment process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |