MT SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising laws related to youth boating safety
Title
Revising laws related to youth boating safety
Sponsors
Sen. Dee Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Fish and Game |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |