MT SB261 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montana sage grouse stewardship act
Title
Montana sage grouse stewardship act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Conference Committee Dissolved |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Conference |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Dissolved |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-30 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2015-01-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-10-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Agriculture
Contracts
Environmental Protection
Fish and Wildlife
Mining and Minerals
Oil and Gas
Planning and Development
Property
Rule Making
State Lands
Contracts
Environmental Protection
Fish and Wildlife
Mining and Minerals
Oil and Gas
Planning and Development
Property
Rule Making
State Lands