MT SB272 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encourage Indian language immersion schools
Title
Encourage Indian language immersion schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - (S) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - (S) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2015-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-11-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-12-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |