MT SB349 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature  
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature  
Summary
Revise state bidding requirements to protect proprietary information
Title
Revise state bidding requirements to protect proprietary information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature   | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress   | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared   | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Vetoed by Governor   | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Concurred   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Concurred   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Concur Motion Failed   | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-07 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House   | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-06 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-06 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation | |
2009-03-09 | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation | |
2009-02-24 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-23 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed on Voice Vote   | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-03 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2009-01-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-17 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-12-09 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=349&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |