MT SB356 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying definition of good cause for water right objections
Title
Clarifying definition of good cause for water right objections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopt Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopt Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress | |
2011-05-13 | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared | |
2011-05-13 | (S) Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-04 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Returned to Senate Not Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-26 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-20 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopt Motion Failed | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-19 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Motion Carried | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-04 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-01 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-31 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-07 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-07 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-02-24 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-02-23 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | |
2011-02-23 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-15 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |